GA SB181 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Act 725
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Act 725
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 16 and Chapter 15 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions for crimes and offenses and the Attorney General, respectively, so as prohibit contingent compensation under certain circumstances; to change provisions relating to the Attorney General's authorization to employ private counsel; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Attorney General; prohibit contingent compensation under certain circumstances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #853 - Agree Sen Am (Y: 158 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #400 - Agree To House Substitute As Amended (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House Vote #309 - Passage (Y: 161 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #137 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #400 - Agree To House Substitute As Amended (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House Vote #309 - Passage (Y: 161 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #137 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Act 725 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2011-04-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-12 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-30 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-21 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-16 | House First Readers | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Read and Referred |