GA SB178 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to regulation of specialized land transactions, so as to provide for statements of account under the "Georgia Condominium Act" and the "Georgia Property Owners' Association Act" for fees owed to condominium associations and property owners' associations, respectively, to facilitate certain property transactions; to provide for information required in a statement of account; to provide for a statutory form for use as a statement of account; to provide for the manner of providing such statements; to provide for fees for certain services; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Specialized Land Transactions; statements of accounts under "Georgia Condominium Act" and "Georgia Property Owners' Association Act"; provide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |