GA SB176 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 17 and Chapter 5 of Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to criminal procedure and drivers' licenses, respectively, so as to enact reforms relating to driving privileges recommended by the Georgia Council on Criminal Justice Reform; to change and provide for the procedure of issuing bench warrants for individuals charged with certain traffic, motorist, and road violations; to remove a barrier to obtaining a habitual violator probationary license; to change provisions relating to third and subsequent convictions under Code Section 40-6-391 involving controlled substances or marijuana; to change provisions relating to reinstatement of certain licenses under certain conditions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Council on Criminal Justice Reform; driving privileges; enact reforms

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #331 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #316 (Y: 154 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #120 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-05-09 Act 228
2017-05-09SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-06SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2017-03-30SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2017-03-24HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-24HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-20HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-06HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-03HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-01SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-01SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-27SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-24SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-15SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-14SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback