GA SB175 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 11 of Title 15 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Juvenile Code, so as to enact reforms relating to juvenile court proceedings recommended by the Georgia Council on Criminal Justice Reform; to allow juvenile courts to impose certain conditions on parents, guardians, and legal custodians of children who are in need of services, delinquent, or involved in a court's community based risk reduction program; to provide for procedure; to change provisions relating to the detention of a delinquent child who has been determined to be incompetent to proceed in juvenile court proceedings; to provide for professional input as to the detention of a child who has been determined to be incompetent to proceed; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Code; juvenile court proceedings; enact reforms

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #315 (Y: 155 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #119 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-05-09 Act 227
2017-05-09SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-03SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2017-03-24HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-03-24HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-06HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-03HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-01SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-01SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-27SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-24SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-15SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-14SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback