GA SB173 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Senate Notice to Reconsider
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to education, so as to provide for the establishment of educational scholarship accounts; to provide for a short title; to provide for definitions; to provide for qualified education expenses; to provide for qualifications for students to participate in the account program; to establish certain requirements for participating schools and service providers; to provide for accounts and account funds; to establish a Parent Review Committee to review expenditures upon request; to authorize the Governor's Office of Student Achievement to promulgate rules and regulations; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

'Georgia Educational Scholarship Act'

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #107 (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #111 (Y: 30 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #112 (Y: 25 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateSenate Notice to Reconsider
2019-03-05SenateSenate Lost
2019-03-05SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-05SenateSenate Engrossed
2019-03-04SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-01SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-25SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-22SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback