GA SB173 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 41 of Title 33 of the O.C.G.A., relating to captive insurance companies, so as to extensively revise certain provisions; to provide for change and revision of certain definitions; to provide for scope of provisions and lines of businesses a captive insurance company may engage to add an agency captive insurance company with certain restrictions; to change certificate of authority requirements; to provide for board of managers; to provide for captive corporate organization requirements making certain captives subject to Title 14; to provide for certain exemptions; to provide for exceptions, fees, and articles of incorporation requirements; to provide for powers and requirements by the Commissioner; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Captive Insurance Companies; provisions; extensively revise
Sponsors
Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Ed Harbison [D] | Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] | Sen. Marty Harbin [R] |
Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Rep. James Shaw [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - House - House Vote #289 (Y: 164 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #154 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #154 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-09 | Act 246 | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2017-03-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-16 | House | House Postponed |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-06 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |