GA SB172 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-12 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-12 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to state government, so as to authorize and provide for the regulation and taxation of sports betting in this state; to provide for additional powers and duties of the Georgia Lottery Corporation; to amend Title 48 of the O.C.G.A., relating to revenue and taxation, so as to exempt wagers placed as part of sports betting; to provide for related matters; to provide for a contingent effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Government; regulation and taxation of sports betting in this state; authorize and provide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |