GA SB172 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 19 of the O.C.G.A., relating to adoption, so as to require a home study by an evaluator prior to the placement of a child into the home of adoptive parents by a third party who is neither a stepparent nor a relative and for such study to recommend placement; to provide for definitions; to change certain provisions relating to surrender or termination of parental or guardian's rights where a child is to be adopted by a third party; to change provisions relating to the filing and contents of a petition for adoption; to change provisions relating to the timing of an adoption hearing, the required records, and filing; to change the contents of the form used for surrender of rights for adoption; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Adoption; require home study by an evaluator prior to the placement of a child; recommend placement; definitions
Sponsors
Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Hardie Davis [D] | Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Sen. Curt Thompson [D] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - House - House Vote #382 - Recon Agree Sen Am (Y: 58 N: 101 NV: 18 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-14 - House - House Vote #381 - Agree Sen Am (Y: 90 N: 63 NV: 24 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #353 - Agree To House Substitute As Amended (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House Vote #307 - Passage (Y: 167 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #171 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House Vote #381 - Agree Sen Am (Y: 90 N: 63 NV: 24 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #353 - Agree To House Substitute As Amended (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House Vote #307 - Passage (Y: 167 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #171 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-12 | Act 189 | |
2011-05-12 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-26 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-14 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2011-04-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-12 | House Third Readers | |
2011-04-11 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-30 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-03-30 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-22 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-21 | House First Readers | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Read and Referred |