GA SB171 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary - Non-Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to crimes and offenses, so as to provide for enhanced penalties for certain offenses committed during an unlawful assembly; to revise the offense of unlawful assembly; to amend Chapter 60 of Title 36 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions regarding provisions applicable to counties and municipal corporations; to amend Chapter 1 of Title 45 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions regarding public officers and employees; to amend Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to state government, so as to prohibit employment and benefits from governments under certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to provide for a short title; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Safe Communities Act of 2021"; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-15 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #652 (Y: 31 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Motion To Remove From The Table: Senate Vote #651 (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-17HouseHouse Second Readers
2022-03-16HouseHouse First Readers
2022-03-15SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2022-03-15SenateSenate Third Read
2022-03-15SenateSenate Taken from Table
2022-03-15SenateSenate Tabled
2022-03-11SenateSenate Read Second Time
2022-03-09SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-16SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-11SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback