GA SB168 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 26 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to nurses, so as to revise certain definitions relating to nurses; to clarify requirements relating to granting authorization to holders of multistate licenses to engage in advanced nursing practice; to repeal a provision relating to the Nurse Licensure Compact; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Nurses; certain definitions; revise
Sponsors
Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #327 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #307 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #103 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #307 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #103 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-25 | Act 48 | |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-03-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |