GA SB163 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 3 of Chapter 3 of Title 38 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to judicial emergency, so as to provide for the suspension of statutory speedy trial requirements when compliance with such statutory speedy trial requirements becomes impracticable following a judicial emergency; to provide for applicable circumstances; to provide for requirements; to provide for notice; to provide for intervention by the Chief Justice of the Supreme Court; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Judicial Emergency; suspension of statutory speedy trial requirements; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Bo Hatchett [R] | Sen. Harold Jones [D] |
Sen. Michael Rhett [D] | Rep. Stan Gunter [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #331 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Passage: House Vote #269 (Y: 157 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #139 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On The Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #127 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Passage: House Vote #269 (Y: 157 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #139 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On The Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #127 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-04 | Act 213 | |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2021-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |