GA SB162 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-6-2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the number of judges of superior courts, so as to provide for an additional judge of the superior court of the Blue Ridge Judicial Circuit; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Blue Ridge Judicial Circuit; additional judge of the superior court; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #172 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-03-09HouseHouse First Readers
2021-03-08SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2021-03-08SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-08SenateSenate Taken from Table
2021-03-08SenateSenate Tabled
2021-03-05SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-03SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2021-02-24SenateSenate Withdrawn & Recommitted
2021-02-16SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-11SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback