GA SB160 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 11 of Title 15 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Juvenile Code, so as to revise the jurisdiction, definition, and penalties for certain crimes and offenses; to add to the superior court's exclusive original jurisdiction the trial of any child 13 to 17 years of age who is alleged to have committed the offense of aggravated assault or aggravated battery upon a peace officer while the peace officer is engaged in, or on account of the performance of, his or her official duties; to clarify the definition of a class A designated felony act in light of the jurisdictional changes; to amend Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to crimes and offenses, so as to provide for definitions; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Back the Badge Act of 2017"

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #306 (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #322 (Y: 102 N: 44 NV: 12 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #89 (Y: 40 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-05-08 Act 198
2017-05-08SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-10SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2017-03-30SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2017-03-24HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-24HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-27HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-24SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-24SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-14SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-10SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback