GA SB156 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-11)
Status: Vetoed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 34 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to labor and industrial relations, so as to provide for the appointment, oath, bond, power, duties, and authority of a chief labor officer; to require the chief labor officer to provide reports related to claims for unemployment compensation benefits and implement effective strategies for the timely payment of benefits; to require the chief labor officer to promptly respond to financial audits; to provide for automatic repeal; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor and Industrial Relations; appointment, oath, bond, power, duties, and authority of a chief labor officer; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #439 (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Passage: House Vote #417 (Y: 142 N: 22 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Reconsider: House Vote #317 (Y: 92 N: 76 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #316 (Y: 85 N: 84 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #181 (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On The Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #127 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10 Effective Date
2021-05-10 Veto V1
2021-05-10SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2021-04-07SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2021-03-31SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2021-03-31HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-31HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2021-03-29HouseHouse Reconsidered
2021-03-29HouseHouse Third Reading Lost
2021-03-29HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-03-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-03-10HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-03-09HouseHouse First Readers
2021-03-08SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-08SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-08SenateSenate Taken from Table
2021-03-05SenateSenate Tabled
2021-03-05SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-05SenateSenate Taken from Table
2021-03-05SenateSenate Tabled
2021-02-26SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-02-25SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-16SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-11SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59620
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/197474
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/198753
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/200008
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/201090
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/202325
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/202527
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59620#18371
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59620#18487
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59620#18669
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59620#18704
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59620#18854
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59620#18941

Bill Comments

feedback