GA SB156 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to sales and use taxes, so as to provide certain restrictions with regard to equalized homestead option sales and use taxes; to provide for limitations on the collection of certain other taxes while such equalized homestead option sales and use tax is being levied; to provide for the sales on which such tax may be levied; to provide limitation on the use of special purpose local option sales taxes which are levied in conjunction with an equalized homestead option sales and use tax; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and Use Taxes; equalized homestead option sales and use taxes; provide certain restrictions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #318 (Y: 45 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #358 (Y: 160 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #96 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #100 (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08 Effective Date
2017-05-08 Act 206
2017-05-08SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-07SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2017-03-30SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2017-03-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-24HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-28HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-27SenateSenate Passed/Adopted As Amended
2017-02-27SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-27SenateSenate Engrossed
2017-02-24SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported As Amended
2017-02-14SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-10SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback