GA SB154 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL To be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to assault and battery, so as to provide for the offenses of aggravated assault and aggravated battery upon a public safety officer while the public safety officer is engaged in, or on account of the performance of, his or her official duties; to amend Code Section 45-9-85 of the O.C.G.A., relating to payment of indemnification for death or disability; to amend Chapter 2 of Title 51 of the O.C.G.A., relating to imputable negligence, so as to provide that tort liability shall be unlimited for parents and guardians having custody and control over a minor child or children under the age of 18 for willful or malicious acts against a public safety officer under certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assault and Battery; public safety officer while engaged in his or her official duties; provide for the offenses of aggravated assault and aggravated battery

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #789 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #90 (Y: 47 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-23HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-30HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-27HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-24SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-24SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-14SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-10SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback