GA SB153 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to education, so as to provide for GOAL academies; to provide for definitions; to provide for partnerships to establish GOAL academies as charter schools; to provide for the transition of system-collaborative state charter schools to GOAL academies; to provide for funding and for the calculation thereof; to provide for designation; to provide for data collection; to provide for eligibility criteria, requirements, and procedures; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Graduation Opportunities and Advanced Learning (GOAL) Act"; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #310 (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Passage: House Vote #303 (Y: 105 N: 59 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #138 (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On The Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #127 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Passage: House Vote #303 (Y: 105 N: 59 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #138 (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On The Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #127 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-04 | Act 156 | |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2021-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Hopper |