GA SB153 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 35 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to law enforcement officers and agencies, so as to provide for the comprehensive regulation of trauma scene cleanup services; to provide for definitions; to provide for registration requirements; to provide for qualifications; to provide for penalties for violations; to provide for emergencies; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for exemptions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trauma Scene Cleanup Services; comprehensive regulation; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #93 (Y: 50 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-14HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2019-03-13HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-07HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-03-05HouseHouse First Readers
2019-03-04SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-04SenateSenate Third Read
2019-02-28SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-02-27SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-22SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-21SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback