GA SB152 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Lost Reconsidered Bill/Resolution
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elementary and secondary education, so as to provide that it is the policy of the state that students who are subject to compulsory attendance shall not be assigned to an alternative education program for more than two semesters except under certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; policy of the state; students who are subject to compulsory attendance; not assigned to alternative education program more than two semesters; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #381 (Y: 65 N: 102 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #382 (Y: 106 N: 56 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #383 (Y: 71 N: 100 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #124 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30HouseHouse Lost Reconsidered Bill/Resolution
2017-03-30HouseHouse Reconsidered
2017-03-30HouseHouse Third Reading Lost
2017-03-30HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-06HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-03HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-01SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-01SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-28SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-27SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-10SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-09SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback