GA SB150 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 16 and 19 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to crimes and offenses and to domestic relations, respectively, so as to prohibit persons convicted of misdemeanor crimes of family violence from receiving, possessing, or transporting a firearm and to prohibit persons subject to family violence protective orders from receiving, possessing, or transporting a firearm; to provide an effective date and applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and Offenses; persons convicted of misdemeanor crimes of family violence receiving, possessing, transporting a firearm; prohibit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-04SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-21SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-20SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback