GA SB15 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-11-129 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to weapons carry license, temporary renewal permit, mandamus, and verification of license, so as to add to the category of former law enforcement officers who are entitled to be issued a weapons carry license without the payment of certain fees; to provide conditions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and Offenses; weapons carry license; add to the category of former law enforcement officers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #321 (Y: 149 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #59 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-05-08 Act 199
2017-05-08SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-03SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2017-03-24HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-03-24HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-21HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-17HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-16SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-16SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-14SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-10SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-11SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-01-10SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback