GA SB148 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act completely revising the laws relative to the governing authority of Chatham County, approved March 29, 1984 (Ga. L. 1984, p. 5050), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 30, 1990 (Ga. L. 1990, p. 3992), so as to remove the term limitations on the office of chairperson; to conform the residency requirement for chairperson to general law; to provide for related matters; to provide a referendum; to provide for effective dates and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Chatham County; remove term limitations on the office of chairperson
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - House - House Vote #269 - Local Calendar Without Hb 624, Hb 626, Hb 627, Sb 129 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #215 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #215 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-12 | Act 185 | |
2011-05-12 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-22 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-11 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-11 | House Third Readers | |
2011-04-11 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-31 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-30 | House First Readers | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Read and Referred |