GA SB145 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-05-04
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-05-04
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 4 of Title 3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to local authorization and regulations for manufacture, distribution, and package sales of distilled spirits, so as to modify the petition requirements for initiating a referendum election for the authorization of the issuance of licenses for the package sale of distilled spirits; to provide an additional method of initiating such a referendum election; to change certain provisions relating to the procedures for calling and conducting certain referendum elections and the nullifications thereof; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Distilled Spirits; initiating a referendum election for the authorization of the issuance of licenses for the package sale of distilled spirits; modify the petition requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - Passage: House Vote #278 (Y: 133 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 53rd: Senate Vote #146 (Y: 18 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #147 (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On The Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #127 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 53rd: Senate Vote #146 (Y: 18 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #147 (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On The Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #127 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective Date 2021-05-04 | |
2021-05-04 | Act 212 | |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Hopper |