GA SB144 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 11 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to taxes on tobacco products, so as to provide for the issuance of special event tobacco permits to licensed dealers authorizing off-premise sales of certain tobacco products at special events or temporary locations; to provide for such permits a fee and limitations as to the validity period; to provide for the promulgation of certain rules and regulations by the state revenue commissioner; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Taxes on Tobacco Products; issuance of special event tobacco permits; authorizing off-premise sales of certain tobacco products; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Anderson [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] |
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - House - House Vote #663 (Y: 152 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #120 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #120 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 509 | |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-29 | House | House Postponed |
2019-03-28 | House | House Postponed |
2019-03-26 | House | House Postponed |
2019-03-25 | House | House Postponed |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |