GA SB143 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for a homestead exemption from certain DeKalb County ad valorem taxes for county purposes in an amount equal to the amount by which the current year assessed value of a homestead exceeds the base year assessed value of such homestead, approved May 5, 2006 (Ga. L. 2006, p. 4636), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 12, 2015 (Ga. L. 2015, p. 4057), so as to remove the tolling provision regarding such exemption; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
DeKalb County Ad Valorem Taxes; homestead exemption; county purposes; tolling provision regarding exemption; remove
Sponsors
Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] | Sen. Steve Henson [D] | Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] |
Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Sen. Gail Davenport [D] | Rep. Tom Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - House - House Vote #262 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #127 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #127 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-02 | Act 73 | |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2017-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-06 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |