GA SB141 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 15 of Title 25 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to carnival ride safety, so as to require the owner of a carnival ride to submit an engineering evaluation with a carnival ride permit application; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Carnival Ride Safety; engineering evaluation with a carnival ride permit application; require
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #338 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #339 (Y: 158 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #86 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #339 (Y: 158 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #86 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-08 | Act 224 | |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2017-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-24 | House | House Postponed |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-24 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |