GA SB140 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 14 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to electrical contractors, plumbers, conditioned air contractors, low-voltage contractors, and utility contractors, so as to authorize the Division of Low-voltage Contractors to require continuing education; to provide for a waiver of continuing education requirements under certain circumstances; to provide for applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Division of Low-voltage Contractors; require continuing education; authorize

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08SenateSenate Recommitted
2017-02-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-17SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-09SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-08SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback