GA SB140 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 14 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to electrical contractors, plumbers, conditioned air contractors, low-voltage contractors, and utility contractors, so as to authorize the Division of Low-voltage Contractors to require continuing education; to provide for a waiver of continuing education requirements under certain circumstances; to provide for applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Division of Low-voltage Contractors; require continuing education; authorize
Sponsors
Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Sen. Ed Harbison [D] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/50367 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/164699 |