GA SB138 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to social service; to repeal a provision relating to the Council for Welfare Administration; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Social Services; provide for various reforms regarding the state's child welfare system
Sponsors
Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Sen. William Jackson [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #357 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #444 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Vote #357 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #142 (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #444 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Vote #357 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #142 (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-05 | Act 77 | |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended |
2015-03-31 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-31 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-19 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2015-03-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-18 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hopper |