GA SB137 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 32 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to property insurance, so as to expand the ownership restriction as it relates to the application of the value of the property covered against loss by fire; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Property Insurance; expand the ownership restriction; value of the property covered against loss by fire
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Harbin [R] | Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] | Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] | Sen. William Ligon [R] |
Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Sen. William Jackson [R] | Rep. James Shaw [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - House - House Vote #730 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #422 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #422 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 365 | |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hopper |