GA SB129 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 5 of Chapter 2 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to service creditable toward retirement benefits, so as to provide for creditable service for certain military service; to provide for application and payment; to provide for related matters; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement; creditable service for certain military service; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #407 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-31HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-30HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-29SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-01-29SenateSenate Third Read
2018-01-25SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-01-24SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-07SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback