GA SB125 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 7 of Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, regarding landlord and tenant in general, so as to repeal Code Section 44-7-19, relating to restrictions on rent regulation by local governments; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Landlord and Tenant; Code Section 44-7-19; repeal; restrictions on rent regulation by local governments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-14 - Senate - Motion To Withdraw And Commit: Senate Vote #219 (Y: 23 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-20SenateSenate Read Second Time
2024-02-16SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2024-02-13SenateSenate Withdrawn & Recommitted
2023-02-09SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-02-08SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback