GA SB122 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 27-3-15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to seasons and bag limits, promulgation of rules and regulations by the board, possession of more than bag limit, and reporting number of deer killed, so as to change certain provisions relating to open seasons for the hunting of deer; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Open Seasons for Hunting Deer; provisions; change
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Williams [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] |
Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hopper |