GA SB121 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 6 of Chapter 4 of Title 26 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to pharmacies, so as to provide that the state health officer may issue a standing order permitting certain persons and entities to obtain opioid antagonists under the conditions the state health officer may impose; to provide for immunity; to amend Chapter 13 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to controlled substances, so as to change the definition of a dangerous drug; to add a drug to Schedule V; to provide for a short title; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Jeffrey Dallas Gay, Jr., Act"

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #307 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #408 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #311 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #99 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18 Effective Date
2017-04-18 Act 19
2017-04-18SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-04SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2017-03-30HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2017-03-30SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended
2017-03-24HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-24HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-20HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-28HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-27SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-02-27SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-02SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback