GA SB119 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 4 of Title 1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to holidays and observances, so as to designate the first Monday in May of each year as "Water Professionals Appreciation Day" in Georgia; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Water Professionals Appreciation Day"; designate the first Monday in May of each year in Georgia
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jeffares [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Ross Tolleson [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Rep. Lynn Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - House - House Vote #309 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #75 (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #75 (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-04-29 | Act 27 | |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2015-03-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Hopper |