GA SB118 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 479
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 479
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 33-24-59.10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to coverage for autism, so as to change the age limit for coverage for autism spectrum disorders for an individual covered under a policy or contract; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Autism; age limit for coverage for autism spectrum disorders for an individual covered under a policy or contract; change
Sponsors
Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] |
Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Sen. Blake Tillery [R] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #770 (Y: 49 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Vote #707 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #426 (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Vote #707 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #426 (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Act 479 | |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2018-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Hopper |