GA SB117 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 6 of Title 16, Article 1 of Chapter 10 of Title 17, Article 2 of Chapter 3 of Title 35, Title 42, and Article 1 of Chapter 2 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to sexual offenses, procedure for sentencing and imposition of punishment, the Georgia Crime Information Center, penal institutions, and general provisions regarding the Department of Human Services, respectively, so as to revise the offenses of improper sexual contact by employee or agent in the first and second degrees; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Department of Human Services; offenses of improper sexual contact by employee or agent in the first and second degrees; revise
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #369 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #315 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #109 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #106 (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #315 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #109 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #106 (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-06 | Act 237 | |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2021-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-22 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Hopper |