GA SB108 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 4 of Title 38 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Department of Veterans Service, so as to require maintenance of a women veterans' office by the commissioner of veterans service; to provide for the purposes of such women veterans' office; to require interaction with veterans court divisions to assist with recruiting and training mentors; to require an annual report; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Veterans Service; maintenance of a women veterans' office by the commissioner of veteran services; require
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] |
Sen. Hunter Hill [R] | Sen. Ed Harbison [D] | Rep. Terry Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #308 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #83 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #83 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-08 | Act 183 | |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2017-03-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-22 | House | House Postponed |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-24 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |