GA SB107 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state flag, seal, and other symbols, so as to provide for placement of a monument in honor of the Honorable Zell Bryan Miller upon the capitol grounds of the state capitol building; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Flag, Seal and Other Symbols; placement of monument in honor of the Honorable Zell Bryan Miller upon capitol grounds of state capitol building; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] |
Sen. Ed Harbison [D] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |