GA SB107 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-20 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to ethics in government, so as to revise the dates for the filing campaign financial disclosure reports to include an additional date prior to the general primary; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ethics in Government; filing campaign financial disclosure reports; additional date prior to general primary; revise the dates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #449 (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #450 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-20HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-15HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-14SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-14SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-14SenateSenate Engrossed
2018-02-12SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-08SenateSenate Recommitted
2017-02-10SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-09SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-02SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-01SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback