GA SB107 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to ethics in government, so as to revise the dates for the filing campaign financial disclosure reports to include an additional date prior to the general primary; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ethics in Government; filing campaign financial disclosure reports; additional date prior to general primary; revise the dates
Sponsors
Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] |
Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #449 (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #450 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #450 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |