GA SB105 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 13 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to controlled substances, so as to provide that possession of certain quantities of marijuana constitute a misdemeanor; to change provisions relating to punishment; to amend Title 15, Title 16, Chapter 7 of Title 17, and Code Section 36-32-6 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to courts, crimes and offenses, pretrial proceedings, and municipal court jurisdiction in marijuana possession cases, respectively, so as to provide for conforming cross-references; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled Substances; possession of certain quantities of marijuana constitute a misdemeanor; provide; punishment; change provisions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08SenateSenate Recommitted
2017-03-01SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-02SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-01SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback