GA SB104 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to kidnapping, false imprisonment, and related offenses, so as to require the posting of the human trafficking hotline model notice in government buildings; to provide for definitions; to provide for exceptions; to require government entities to have a hyperlink to the human trafficking hotline model notice on their websites; to delete the sunset provision; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kidnapping, False Imprisonment and Related Offenses; human trafficking hotline model notice in government buildings; require posting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #387 (Y: 45 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #423 (Y: 93 N: 74 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #424 (Y: 119 N: 43 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #357 (Y: 161 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #115 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08 Effective Date
2017-05-08 Act 182
2017-05-08SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-06SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2017-03-30SenateSenate Conference Committee Report Adopted
2017-03-30HouseHouse Conference Committee Report Adopted
2017-03-30HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed 146th, 82nd, 40th
2017-03-30SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed 41st, 35th, 18th
2017-03-30HouseHouse Insisted
2017-03-30SenateSenate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
2017-03-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted As Amended
2017-03-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-06HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-03HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-01SenateSenate Passed/Adopted As Amended
2017-03-01SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-27SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-24SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-01-31SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback