GA SB103 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Veto V11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Veto V11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 3 of Title 6 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to powers of local governments as to air facilities, so as to provide that airports owned, controlled, or operated by a county, municipality, or other political subdivision of this state shall not assess any fee to a veteran for motor vehicle parking; to provide for a definition; to provide for exceptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Air Facilities; airports owned by a county, municipality shall not assess any fee to a veteran for motor vehicle parking; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Gail Davenport [D] | Sen. Steve Henson [D] | Sen. Ed Harbison [D] | Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] |
Sen. Harold Jones [D] | Sen. Michael Rhett [D] | Rep. Al Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #422 (Y: 163 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #435 (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #173 (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #435 (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #173 (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Veto V11 | |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-04-02 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-04-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hopper |