GA SB103 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 3-3-7 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to local authorization and regulation of sales of alcoholic beverages on Sunday, so as to allow for local authorization and regulation of the sale of alcoholic beverages for consumption on the premises on Sundays during the St. Patrick's Day holiday period; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales of Alcoholic Beverages on Sunday; allow for local authorization; consumption on the premises on Sundays during St. Patrick's Day holiday period
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - House Vote #173 (Y: 144 N: 21 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #96 (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #96 (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | Effective Date | |
2015-03-13 | Act 10 | |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2015-03-11 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |