GA SB102 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 46 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to public utilities and public transportation, so as to prohibit governmental entities from adopting any policy that prohibits the connection or reconnection of any utility service based upon the type or source of energy or fuel; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Utilities and Public Transportation; governmental entities from adopting any policy that prohibits the connection or reconnection of any utility service based upon the type or source of energy or fuel; prohibit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-02-24SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-04SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback