GA SB102 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-15 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-15 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elementary and secondary education, so as to provide for a pilot program to plan, implement, and improve sustainable community schools; to provide for planning grants; to provide for operational grants; to provide for definitions; to provide for applications for grants; to require the development of community school plans; to provide for requirements for grant recipients; to delineate the purposes for which grant funds may be used; to provide for reports; to provide for automatic repeal; to provide for related matters; to provide for a short title; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Unlocking the Promise Community Schools Act"; enact
Sponsors
Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] | Sen. Nan Orrock [D] | Sen. Steve Henson [D] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] |
Sen. Harold Jones [D] | Sen. Valencia Seay [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #635 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #635 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hopper |