GA SB100 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1A of Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 46 of the O.C.G.A., relating to telephone system for the physically impaired, so as to change certain provisions relating to the establishment, administration, and operation of the state-wide dual party relay service and audible universal information access service; to change certain legislative findings and declarations; to modify the prohibition as to the distribution of telecommunications equipment under the telecommunications equipment distribution program based on a certain income level; to provide that wireless devices and applications may be distributed as part of the telecommunications equipment distribution program; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Telephone System for the Physically Impaired; state-wide dual party relay service and audible universal information access service; provisions; change
Sponsors
Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. Harold Jones [D] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] |
Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Rep. John Carson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - House - House Vote #262 (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #97 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #97 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 259 | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hopper |