GA SB10 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Act 868
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to offenses against public order, so as to provide for an offense of promoting illegal drag racing and laying drags; to provide for an offense of knowingly attending an illegal drag race or laying drags exhibition; to provide for punishment; to amend Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as to provide for classification and registration of high-performance vehicles; to provide for the issuance of special license plates for high-performance vehicles; to provide for related matters; to provide for a short title; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Jaye Mize Law"; promoting illegal drag racing and laying drags; provide for an offense

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-04 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #869 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - Passage: House Vote #835 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #3 By The Senator From The 7th: Senate Vote #194 (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #195 (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-13 Act 868
2022-05-13SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2022-04-07SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2022-04-04SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2022-04-01HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2022-04-01HouseHouse Third Readers
2022-03-30HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-03-10HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-03-09HouseHouse First Readers
2021-03-08SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-08SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-08SenateSenate Taken from Table
2021-03-08SenateSenate Tabled
2021-02-26SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-02-25SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-01-26SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-01-14SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/58927
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/195798
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/198782
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/200025
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/211039
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/212171
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/199846
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/199920
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/200020
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/58927#18501
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/58927#18500
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/58927#19707
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/58927#19895

Bill Comments

feedback