GA HR963 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-28 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Legislative and Congressional Reapportionment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Georgia so as to provide procedures and standards for legislative and congressional reapportionment; to provide for related matters; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislative and congressional reapportionment; procedures and standards; provide - CA

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2016-01-27HouseHouse First Readers
2016-01-26HouseHouse Hopper
2015-12-11HouseHouse Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback